Global Patent Index - EP 1243869 A2

EP 1243869 A2 2002-09-25 - Mixed boiler

Title (en)

Mixed boiler

Title (de)

Wärmeerzeuger für Heizzwecke und Warmwasserbereitung

Title (fr)

Chaudiére mixte

Publication

EP 1243869 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01123489 A

Priority

DE 10114507 A

Abstract (en)

The device has condensing boiler, heat exchanger, and control and regulation devices, in a housing. Connections for pipes are positioned along the vertical central axis of the rear housing wall (12), and are extended into the vertical edge sections of the back wall via curved pipe sections (20,21). Pairs of appliance connections also located on the rear wall are at even distance to the facing vertical sides of the housing. The connections are extended via long and a short pipe section (22,23) into the same areas of the back wall. The free ends of all pipe sections are held in a holder bar so that they are located in a common installation plane with installation connections (24-27).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wärmeerzeuger für Heizzwecke und Warmwasserbereitung mit einem Brennwertgerät, einem Wärmetauscher und Steuer- und Regeleinrichtungen, die in einem Gerätegehäuse untergebracht sind, auf dessen Rückwand Geräte-Anschlüsse für Anschluss- und Verbindungs-Rohrleitungen vorgesehen sind. Ist nach der Erfindung vorgesehen, dass ein Teil der Geräte-Anschlüsse auf der vertikalen Mittelachse der Rückwand angeordnet und mittels abgebogener Rohrstücke in den einen oder anderen vertikalen Randbereich der Rückwand geführt sind, dass Paare von Geräte-Anschlüssen auf der Rückwand angeordnet sind, wobei diese in gleichem Abstand zu den beiden zugekehrten vertikalen Seiten des Gerätegehäuses stehen, dass diese Paare von Geräte-Anschlüssen mittels eines kurzen und eines langen Rohrstückes zu demselben Randbereich der Rückwand wie die an den mittleren Geräte-Anschlüssen angeschlossenen Rohrstücke geführt sind, und dass die freien Enden aller Rohrstücke in einer Halteleiste so gehalten sind, dass sie mit Installationsanschlüssen in einer gemeinsamen Installationsebene liegen, dann kann die Installation am Einsatzort leicht auf die örtlichen Verhältnisse angepasst werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243869 A2 20020925; EP 1243869 A3 20040331; EP 1243869 B1 20060809; DE 10114507 A1 20020926; DE 50110694 D1 20060921

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061024

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110694 P 20060921

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-08-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI