Global Patent Index - EP 1243870 A2

EP 1243870 A2 2002-09-25 - Radiator

Title (en)

Radiator

Title (de)

Heizkörper

Title (fr)

Radiateur

Publication

EP 1243870 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02001649 A

Priority

DE 10113589 A

Abstract (en)

The heater (1) has a forward flow (7) pipe connected to the inflow opening (4) of a first radiator (2), and has a return flow (8) pipe connected to the outflow opening (5) of a second radiator. The at least two radiators are vertically superimposed. The entire hot water flows through the at least two radiators. In the case of more than two radiators, the inflow opening of one radiator is connected to the outflow opening of the previous radiator, and the outflow opening connected to the inflow opening of the next radiator, so that all the hot water flows through all the radiators.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Heizkörper 1, insbesondere Designheizkörper, mit einem Vorlaufstutzen 7 und einem Rücklaufstutzen 8 zum Anschluß des Heizkörpers 1 an die Rohrleitungen einer Heizungsanlage, sowie mit mindestens zwei vertikal ausgerichteten und übereinander angeordneten Flachheizkörpern 2, die jeweils eine Zulauföffnung 4 und eine Ablauföffnung 5 für Heizwasser aufweisen, und von denen einer als erster Flachheizkörper 2 und einer als letzter Flachheizkörper 2 bezeichnet wird, wobei der Vorlaufstutzen 7 an die Zulauföffnung 4 des ersten Flachheizkörpers 2 und der Rücklaufstutzen 8 an die Ablauföffnung 5 des letzten Flachheizkörpers 2 angeschlossen ist, und daß die Ablauföffnung 5 des ersten Flachheizkörpers 2 mit der Zulauföffnung 4 des letzten Flachheizkörpers 2 derart verbunden ist, daß beim Betrieb des Heizkörpers 1 das gesamte Heizwasser vollständig durch beide Flachheizkörper 2 fließt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/12; F24D 19/06; F28F 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/06 (2006.01); F24H 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/06 (2013.01); F24H 9/122 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29918271 U1 20000120 - KERMI GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243870 A2 20020925; EP 1243870 A3 20040114; DE 10113589 A1 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-11-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24H 9/12 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24D 19/06 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 28F 9/26 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI