Global Patent Index - EP 1243884 A2

EP 1243884 A2 2002-09-25 - Heat exchanger tube

Title (en)

Heat exchanger tube

Title (de)

Wärmetauscherrohr

Title (fr)

Tube d'échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1243884 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02075849 A

Priority

US 81450801 A

Abstract (en)

A folded heat exchanger tube (10) of the type that is rigidified with a pair of abutted 90 degree walls (16) extending along the interior length thereof, so as to join the lower (12) and upper (14) walls thereof, has a separate inner web member (20) anchored and fixed inside between a pair of curved, out turned feet (18) on the abutted walls (16) and the inner surface of the lower wall (12). A widened and flattened central channel (24) in the web (20) is engaged by the under surfaces of the curved feet (18), and is approximately as wide as the total width of the tow feet (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/02 (2006.01); F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28F 1/42 (2006.01); F28F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0391 (2013.01); B21C 37/225 (2013.01); F28F 3/025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243884 A2 20020925; EP 1243884 A3 20021009; EP 1243884 B1 20060322; DE 60209994 D1 20060511; DE 60209994 T2 20060907; JP 2002327994 A 20021115; JP 3631214 B2 20050323; US 2004182559 A1 20040923

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MAHLE INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20180103

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20161208 AND 20161214

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAHLE INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC., TROY, MICH., US

- Document: DE 60209994

2015-10-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60209994

- Representative's name: BRP RENAUD UND PARTNER MBB, DE

2015-10-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60209994

- Representative's name: BRP RENAUD UND PARTNER MBB RECHTSANWAELTE PATE, DE

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60209994 P 20060511

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040708

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030409

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI