Global Patent Index - EP 1243974 A1

EP 1243974 A1 2002-09-25 - Single-layer type electrophotosensitive material

Title (en)

Single-layer type electrophotosensitive material

Title (de)

Einschichtiges elektrophotographisches Element

Title (fr)

Matériau électrophotosensible à une couche

Publication

EP 1243974 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01302491 A

Priority

EP 01302491 A

Abstract (en)

Disclosed is a single-layer type electrophotosensitive material which comprises a conductive substrate, and a photosensitive layer made of a binder resin containing at least an electric charge generating material and an electric charge transferring material formed on said conductive substrate, wherein said photosensitive layer contains a polyalkylene glycol compound represented by the formula Ä1Ü: A1-O-Ä(CH2)m-OÜn-A2 wherein A1 and A2 are the same or different and represent an alkyl or aryl group having 1 to 50 carbon atoms, or a group: -CO-R<10> (R<10> represents an alkyl or aryl group having 1 to 50 carbon atoms), m represents an integer of 1 to 5, and n represents an integer of 2 to 100, which is superior in wear resistance, sensitivity and gas resistance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 5/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/0567 (2013.01); G03G 5/0564 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243974 A1 20020925; EP 1243974 B1 20060726; DE 60121724 D1 20060907; DE 60121724 T2 20070802

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130319

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60121724

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130319

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070427

2006-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60121724 P 20060907

2006-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2006-07-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KYOCERA MITA CORPORATION

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050408

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI