Global Patent Index - EP 1243986 A1

EP 1243986 A1 2002-09-25 - Time piece with power generator

Title (en)

Time piece with power generator

Title (de)

Uhrwerk mit Spannungsgenerator

Title (fr)

Pièce d'horlogerie comportant une génératrice

Publication

EP 1243986 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01201061 A

Priority

EP 01201061 A

Abstract (en)

The watch has a sprung barrel (5,6) which drives hands (7) and a generator rotor (2). The generator winding (3) is connected through a rectifier (11) to a control unit (12) which also receives time data from a timebase (13). The control unit regulates the generator speed by a short circuiting switch (16) but if synchronisation is lost the generator is locked by a magnetic element (18) which has a torque equal to a preset threshold value (Cp). An Independent claim is also included for a method of setting the barrel and magnetic element torques during fabrication

Abstract (fr)

La pièce d'horlogerie comprend une base de temps (13), une génératrice (1) composée notamment d'un rotor (2) à aimants permanents et d'au moins une bobine (3), un barillet (5) à ressort couplé à la génératrice pour l'entraîner, des moyens d'indication horaire analogique (7) également entraînés par le barillet. Ces moyens d'indication horaire fonctionnent sensiblement de manière synchrone relativement à la base de temps tant que le couple CB fourni par le barillet est supérieur ou égal à un couple minimum de synchronisation CSYNC. Cette pièce comprend également des moyens de freinage (12, 16) de la génératrice et des moyens aimantés (18) ayant avec le rotor, lors de l'arrêt de la génératrice, un couple de positionnement statique CP permettant de maintenir le rotor dans une position sensiblement fixe. Les moyens de freinage de la génératrice sont actionnés dès que le fonctionnement des moyens d'indication horaire n'est plus sensiblement synchrone avec ladite base de temps et les moyens aimantés (18) sont agencés de manière à ce que le couple de positionnement statique CP soit supérieur ou sensiblement égal à un couple de référence CREF pour lequel le couple CB exercé par le barillet sur le rotor est égal audit couple minimum de synchronisation CSYNC. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 10/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243986 A1 20020925; EP 1243986 B1 20091028; DE 60140294 D1 20091210

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2017-12-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171130

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60140294

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120320

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100729

2009-12-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60140294 P 20091210

2009-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-10-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2009-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2009-10-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-07-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TIME PIECE WITH POWER GENERATOR

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETA SA MANUFACTURE HORLOGERE SUISSE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI