Global Patent Index - EP 1244040 A2

EP 1244040 A2 2002-09-25 - Apparatus and method for automatic management of feature-related and time-related data

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for automatic management of feature-related and time-related data

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum automatischen Management von merkmals- und zeitbezogenen Daten

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé de gestion automatique de données temporelles relatives à des caractéristiques

Publication

EP 1244040 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005356 A

Priority

DE 10113499 A

Abstract (en)

Multiple data-recording devices (DRDs) (2) record feature-related data (FRD). A central processing device (CPD) (5) stores groups of data (DG1,DG2) assigned to the FRD. A data-transmission device (12) transfers data between the DRDs and the CPD and between the CPD and processing units (9). The CPD receives FRD from the DRDs, detects a data group that is associated with the FRD received and that contains first (DG-1) and second (DG-2) data units. An Independent claim is also included for a method for automated management of feature-related and time-related data.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zum automatischen Management von merkmalsbezogenen und insbesondere personenbezogenen Daten und von zeitbezogenen Daten, die besonders für die weitgehend automatisierte Abrechnung von Waren und Dienstleistungen geeignet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244040 A2 20020925; EP 1244040 A3 20021016; DE 10113499 A1 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20090523

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030403

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI