Global Patent Index - EP 1244063 A1

EP 1244063 A1 2002-09-25 - Method and apparatus for making an image in several steps

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for making an image in several steps

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen eines Druckbildes in mehreren Schritten

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour former une image en plusieurs étapes

Publication

EP 1244063 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02090086 A

Priority

DE 10114535 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002135809A1] In a method and apparatus for generating a print image, particularly a franking imprint, on a first image carrier composed of at least one first partial image and a second partial image offset thereto transversely relative to a first direction, whereby a relative motion between a print head and an image carrier is generated along a first direction in a first step for generating the first partial image. A transverse offset between the print head and the image carrier is generated in a second direction proceeding transversely to the first direction in a second step. A relative motion between the print head and the image carrier is generated along the first direction in a third step for generating the second partial image. The waiting time interval between the end of the printing event of the first step and the beginning of the printing event of the third step has a length that is varied according to a prescribed function.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Erzeugen eines Druckbildes (3), insbesondere eines Frankierabdruckes, auf einem Bildträger (4) aus wenigstens einem ersten Teilbild (3.1) und einem quer zu einer ersten Richtung (5) dazu versetzt angeordneten zweiten Teilbild (3.2), bei dem zum Erzeugen des ersten Teilbildes (3.1) in einem ersten Schritt entlang einer ersten Richtung (5) eine Relativbewegung zwischen einem Druckkopf (2) und dem Bildträger (4) erzeugt wird, in einem zweiten Schritt ein Querversatz zwischen Druckkopf (2) und Bildträger (4) in einer quer zur ersten Richtung (5) verlaufenden zweiten Richtung (10) erzeugt wird und in einem dritten Schritt zum Erzeugen des zweiten Teilbildes (3.2) eine Relativbewegung zwischen Druckkopf (2) und Bildträger (4) entlang der ersten Richtung (5) erzeugt wird, wobei das Wartezeitintervall zwischen dem Ende des Druckvorgangs des ersten Schrittes und dem Beginn des Druckvorgangs des dritten Schrittes eine nach einer vorgegebenen Funktion variierende Länge aufweist. Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00532 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00564 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00637 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00919 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 10114535 C1 20020801; EP 1244063 A1 20020925; EP 1244063 B1 20031210; US 2002135809 A1 20020926; US 7178894 B2 20070220

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50200132

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Free text: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE)

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040309

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200132 P 20040122

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI