Global Patent Index - EP 1244065 A1

EP 1244065 A1 2002-09-25 - Franking machine with retrofittable scale

Title (en)

Franking machine with retrofittable scale

Title (de)

Frankiermaschine mit nachrüstbarer Wiegeeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine à affranchir avec rajout ultérieur d'une balance

Publication

EP 1244065 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02090094 A

Priority

DE 10114529 A

Abstract (en)

A franking machine has a casing made from a first casing part (1.1) that is designed to apply a weighing unit that can be retrofit. The first casing part defines a bay (2) in the casing designed for inserting the weighing unit. Near the bay there are fastening devices (3) designed for fastening a second casing part (1.2) for sealing off the bay.

Abstract (de)

Frankiermaschine mit einem Gehäuse aus wenigstens einem ersten Gehäuseteil (1.1), der zum Anbringen einer nachrüstbaren Wiegeeinheit (9) ausgebildet ist, wobei der erste Gehäuseteil (1.1) eine Einbuchtung (2) im Gehäuse definiert, welche zum Einsetzen der Wiegeeinheit (9) ausgebildet ist, und im Bereich der Einbuchtung (2) erste Befestigungsmittel (3) vorgesehen sind, die zum Befestigen eines die Einbuchtung (2) verschließenden zweiten Gehäuseteils (1.2) ausgebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00233 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00701 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244065 A1 20020925; EP 1244065 B1 20130731; DE 10114529 A1 20021002; US 2002138453 A1 20020926; US 7343359 B2 20080311

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, 16547 BIRKENWERDER, DE

- Document: DE 50215809

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG, 16547 BIRKENWERDER, DE

- Document: DE 50215809

- Effective date: 20130801

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50215809

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-03-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50215809

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2014-08-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50215809

- Effective date: 20140502

2014-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140502

2013-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG, CH

2013-09-26 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50215809

- Effective date: 20130926

2013-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2013-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2013-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-04 [16A] NEW DOCUMENTS DISCOVERED AFTER COMPLETION OF THE EP-SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI