Global Patent Index - EP 1244066 A1

EP 1244066 A1 2002-09-25 - Franking machine with clamping device for a mail piece

Title (en)

Franking machine with clamping device for a mail piece

Title (de)

Frankiermaschine mit Klemmeinrichtung für ein Poststück

Title (fr)

Machine à affranchir avec dispositif de serrage pour un pli postal

Publication

EP 1244066 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02090095 A

Priority

DE 10114530 A

Abstract (en)

A clamping device has a clamping unit (3) to work together with an item of post (9) and a gearing device (6,8) linked to the clamping unit and a driving mechanism for moving the clamping unit towards a stop element. The clamping unit and/or the gearing device have a compensating section (15).

Abstract (de)

Frankiermaschine mit einer über eine Antriebseinrichtung (5) antreibbaren Klemmeinrichtung (4) zum Festklemmen eines zu frankierenden Poststückes (9) gegen ein Anschlagelement (10), wobei die Klemmeinrichtung (4) eine zum Zusammenwirken mit dem Poststück (9) vorgesehene Klemmeinheit (3) und eine mit der Klemmeinheit (3) und der Antriebseinrichtung verbundene Getriebeeinrichtung (6, 8) zum Verfahren der Klemmeinheit (3) in Richtung des Anschlagelementes umfasst und wobei die Klemmeinheit (3) und/oder die Getriebeeinrichtung (6, 8) zumindest einen Kompensationsabschnitt (15) aufweist, der derart elastisch ausgebildet ist, dass bei einem vorgegebenen Antriebsweg der Antriebseinrichtung (5) eine Kompensation unterschiedlicher Dicken des Poststückes (9) durch elastische Verformung des Kompensationsabschnitts (15) erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00556 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00685 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244066 A1 20020925; DE 10114530 A1 20021002; US 2002136580 A1 20020926; US 6692166 B2 20040217

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100615

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI