Global Patent Index - EP 1244068 A2

EP 1244068 A2 2002-09-25 - Control device for authorizing access or operation of doors or windows

Title (en)

Control device for authorizing access or operation of doors or windows

Title (de)

Kontrollvorrichtung zur Zugangs- oder Bedienungsberechtigung für Türen oder Fenster

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle d'autorisation d'accès ou de manoeuvre pour portes ou fenêtres

Publication

EP 1244068 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112938 A

Priority

DE 10114214 A

Abstract (en)

The device has an access monitoring system with biometric identification or authentication with at least one optoelectronic image acquisition unit with a fingerprint sensor and an electronic evaluation device for exchanging information with a memory for identification information. The unit is mounted on a door or window fitting so that the person to be detected has to place a finger or fingers in the its detection area when operating the fitting. The device has an access monitoring system with biometric identification or authentication of a person to be detected and containing at least one optoelectronic image acquisition unit with a fingerprint sensor (1) and an electronic evaluation device for exchanging information with a memory for identification information. The image acquisition unit is mounted on a door or window fitting so that the person to be detected has to place a finger or fingers in the detection area of the unit when operating the fitting. Independent claims are also included for the following: a window with a lock and a monitoring device and a door with a lock and a monitoring device.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kontrollvorrichtung für Türen oder Fenster besitzt eine über eine Freigabeeinrichtung (18) zumindest teilweise entriegelbare Schließvorrichtung und/oder Alarmvorrichtung. Das Zugangskontrollsystem mit einer biometrischen Identifizierung bzw. Authentisierung eines Benutzers umfasst mindestens eine punktuelle elektronische Bildaufnahmeeinheit in Form eines Fingerabdrucksensors (1) zur Erfassung eines oder mehrerer Fingerabdrücke eines Benutzers und eine elektronische Auswerteinrichtung (4, 12) im Informationsaustausch mit einer Speichereinrichtung für Kennungsinformation. Die optoelektronische Bildaufnahmeeinheit ist so an einem Tür- oder Fensterbelag angeordnet, dass der Benutzer bei der Betätigung des Tür- oder Fensterbelags zwangsläufig den oder die gewünschten Finger in den Erfassungsbereich oder optoelektronischen Bildaufnahmeeinheit bringt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/00 (2013.01); E05B 17/22 (2013.01); G07C 9/00158 (2013.01); G07C 9/00563 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00841 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244068 A2 20020925; EP 1244068 A3 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061220

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-07-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050527

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI