Global Patent Index - EP 1244073 A2

EP 1244073 A2 2002-09-25 - Method and sensor for validation of documents

Title (en)

Method and sensor for validation of documents

Title (de)

Verfahren und Sensor für die Echtheitserkennung von Dokumenten

Title (fr)

Méthode et palpeur pour la validation de documents

Publication

EP 1244073 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005012 A

Priority

DE 10113268 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves stimulating a security element (13',13'',13''') on a document (11) with radiation of a fixed pre-set stimulation wavelength, whereupon radiation is emitted, detected (17) and evaluated (18). The intensity profile of the emitted radiation in a fixed predefined wavelength range is detected over a defined measurement period after stimulation and analyzed for real-time detection. <??>AN Independent claim is also included for the following: a sensor for real-time detection of security characteristics for valuable and/or security documents.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren für die Echtheitserkennung von Wert- und/oder Sicherheitsdokumenten und ein entsprechender Sensor vorgeschlagen, wobei mindestens ein Sicherheitselement (13, 13', 13") in oder auf das Wert- und/oder Sicherheitsdokument ein- und/oder aufgebracht ist. Dabei wird das Sicherheitselement mit Strahlung einer fest voreingestellten Anregungswellenlänge angeregt. Das Sicherheitselement emittiert daraufhin Strahlung, wobei die emittierte Strahlung von einem Erfassungseinheit (17) erfasst und von einer Auswerteeinheit (18) ausgewertet wird. Das Intensitätsprofil der emittierten Strahlung wird in einem fest vorgegebenen Wellenlängenbereich über einem vorgegebenen Messzeitraum nach der Anregung erfasst und zur Echtheitserkennung analysiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/1205 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/1205 (2017.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244073 A2 20020925; EP 1244073 A3 20040609; DE 10113268 A1 20020919; US 2002131618 A1 20020919; US 7092583 B2 20060815

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20111124

2005-03-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH

2004-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI