Global Patent Index - EP 1244074 A1

EP 1244074 A1 2002-09-25 - Storing, transporting and dispensing device for coins, loose, wrapped or bagged as well as other articles

Title (en)

Storing, transporting and dispensing device for coins, loose, wrapped or bagged as well as other articles

Title (de)

Magazinier-, Transport- und Ausgabevorrichtung für lose, gerollte oder in Beutel verpackte Münzen oder andere Materialien

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport, d'emmagasinage et de distribution de pièces de monnaie en vrac, enveloppées ou empaquetées ainsi que d'autres articles

Publication

EP 1244074 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01106987 A

Priority

EP 01106987 A

Abstract (en)

Fastened to slide on an endless chain (1) moved vertically and horizontally in multiple loops by an electrically motorized drive, open pods (2) with toothed gearing (8) hold loose coins, bags of coins or similar products. The fastening/turning point (3) for the conveyor pods is set so high that the openings (4) for the pods are affected by a deeply positioned center of gravity unaffected by the chain's direction of movement so that the contents of the pods is kept safe.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren fuer die Magazinierung, den Transport und die Ausgabe von lose oder in Beutel verpackte Muenzen oder aehnliche Produkte, bei der die Lagerung und der Transport der Produkte in Behaelter / Gondeln erfolgt die einseitig schwenkbar an einer, in Schleifen laufenden, endlosen Kette befestigt sind. Diese Gondeln sind als offene Schalen ausgebildet, deren Oeffnung unabhaengig von der Bewegungsrichtung immer nach oben gerichtet ist. Durch eine Zwangsfuehrung werden die Gondeln ueber der Ausgabeoeffnung so gedreht das sie sich entleeren. Das neue Verfahren ermoeglicht es, lose oder in Beutel verpackte Muenzen oder Materialien mit aehnlicher Konsistenz, mit geringem Aufwand und geringem Platzbedarf zu speichern, zu transportieren und an einer genau definierten Stelle auszugeben. Dieses Verfahren kann zum Beispiel sehr wirtschaftlich in Geldwechsel- und Geldausgabeautomaten eingesetzt werden, wo auf engem Raum in Beutel verpackte Muenzen gespeichert und ausgegeben werden muessen. Durch die Veraenderung der Transportgondeln und der Transportkette ist diese Vorrichtung sehr leicht an andere Mate-rialien anzupassen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 11/48 (2006.01); G07F 11/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/00 (2013.01); G07F 11/48 (2013.01); G07F 11/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244074 A1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040720

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-06-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI