Global Patent Index - EP 1244079 A2

EP 1244079 A2 2002-09-25 - Improvements relating to entertainment machines

Title (en)

Improvements relating to entertainment machines

Title (de)

Verbesserungen betreffend Unterhaltungsmaschinen

Title (fr)

Améliorations concernant des machines d'amusement

Publication

EP 1244079 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02252071 A

Priority

GB 0107444 A

Abstract (en)

An entertainment machine comprising a display arranged to display a game, the display comprising two or more zones 28, 30, 32, each with an associated identifier 34, 36, 38. The identifier may comprise for example a colour, a symbol or a pattern. According to predetermined conditions in the game, a zone selector 24 determines by displaying the identifier which zone is associated with the zone selector. In the preferred embodiment the identifier comprises a colour applied to a region of the display, which determines in which zone 28, 30, 32 a player is playing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3244 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244079 A2 20020925; EP 1244079 A3 20040303; GB 0107444 D0 20010516; GB 0206790 D0 20020501; GB 2374451 A 20021016; GB 2374451 B 20040707

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-12-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI