Global Patent Index - EP 1244081 A1

EP 1244081 A1 2002-09-25 - Method of radio communication in an alarm system

Title (en)

Method of radio communication in an alarm system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Funkübertragung in einem Gefahrenmeldesystem

Title (fr)

Procede de communication radio dans un systeme d'alarme

Publication

EP 1244081 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02006120 A

Priority

DE 10114313 A

Abstract (en)

A main station (M) and subsidiary stations (S1-S4) each have transmitter-receiver devices (TRDs). Each subsidiary station attempts to transmit data directly to the main station via a radio link. Any interference in direct radio transmission between the main station and one of the subsidiary stations affects the transmission/reception properties of antennas for the TRDs of the main station or the subsidiary station not reaching the main station.

Abstract (de)

Bei bidirektionalen Funkverbindungen zwischen Nebenstationen (S1,S2,S3,S4) und Hauptstationen (M) einer Funk-Gefahrenmeldeanlage können sogenannte Fading-Löcher, die durch Interferenzen auftreten, zu Beeinträchtigungen im Funkverkehr führen. In der Regel beeinträchtigen Fading-Löcher nur die Kommunikation zwischen zwei Sende- und Empfangseinrichtungen. Ist nun die Kommunikation zwischen einer Hauptstation (M) und einer Nebenstation (S1) gestört, so sind in der Regel die Kommunikationen zwischen der Hauptstation (M) und anderen Nebenstationen (S2, S3, S4) wie auch zwischen einzelnen Nebenstationen (S1, S2, S3, S4) untereinander dennoch problemlos möglich. In diesem Fall kann eine Nebenstation (S1) daher ihre Daten über eine weitere Nebenstation (S2) an die Hauptstation (M) senden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/00; G08B 25/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/00 (2006.01); G08B 25/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/009 (2013.01); G08B 25/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244081 A1 20020925; EP 1244081 B1 20031217; AT 256906 T 20040115; DE 10114313 A1 20030515; DE 10114313 C2 20031204; ES 2213128 T3 20040816

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180312

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170602

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170207

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80333 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50200142

2016-09-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50200142

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL OLIVER, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

2016-06-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS GEBAEUDESICHERHEIT GMBH & CO. OHG, 80807 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50200142

2016-06-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS GEBAEUDESICHERHEIT GMBH & CO. OHG, 80807 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50200142

2016-06-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50200142

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL OLIVER, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

2016-03-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-06-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Document: AT 256906 T

- Effective date: 20150421

2015-01-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130319

2014-06-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140611

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131002

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130318

2014-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130318

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-11-20 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20040400276

- Effective date: 20131002

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-10-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS GEBAUDESICHERHEIT G.M.B.H. & CO. OHG

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS GEBAEUDESICHERHEIT GMBH AND CO. OHG, DE

2013-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Document: AT 256906 T

- Effective date: 20130226

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120404

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120319

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120308

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-06-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120320

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-12-12 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 50200142

2011-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50200142

2011-10-01 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 50200142

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040517

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213128 T3

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-03-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040213

2004-02-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040400276

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200142 P 20040129

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI