Global Patent Index - EP 1244094 A1

EP 1244094 A1 2002-09-25 - Method and apparatus for determining a quality measure for an audio signal

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for determining a quality measure for an audio signal

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung eines Qualitätsmasses eines Audiosignals

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de détermination de la qualité d'un signal audio

Publication

EP 1244094 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01810285 A

Priority

EP 01810285 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method for determining a quality measure (2) for an audio signal (1), whereby the speech signal component (4) is first extracted from the audio signal (1). A reference signal (6) is then generated using said signal, by means of noise suppression (7) and interrupt interpolation (8). The above is compared with the speech signal (4) and an intrusive quality value (10) thus determined. A further quality value (15) is determined, by determining and evaluating Codec-related signal distortions in the speech signal (4). A further quality value (17) is generated from information on the detected signal interruptions (8). The quality measure (2) is finally determined as a linear combination (16) of the various quality values (10, 15, 17, 18).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Bestimmung eines Qualitätsmasses (2) eines Audiosignals (1) werden aus dem Audiosignal (1) zunächst die Sprachsignalanteile (4) extrahiert. Anhand dieses Signals wird anschliessend mittels Rauschunterdrückung (7) und Unterbruchsinterpolation (8) ein Referenzsignal (6) generiert. Dieses wird mit dem Sprachsignal (4) verglichen und auf diese Weise ein intrusiver Qualitätswert (10) bestimmt. Ein weiterer Qualitätswert (15) wird bestimmt, indem Codec-bedingte Signalverzerrungen im Sprachsignal (4) bestimmt und bewertet werden (12, 14). Ein nächster Qualitätswert (17) wird den Informationen über die detektierten Signalunterbrüche (8) generiert. Das Qualitätsmass (2) wird schliesslich als Linearkombination (16) der verschiedenen Qualitätswerte (10, 15, 17, 18) bestimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 25/69 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 25/69 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0644526 A1 19950322 - ALCATEL ITALIA [IT], et al
  • [A] US 5583968 A 19961210 - TROMPF MICHAEL [DE]
  • [A] WO 0072453 A1 20001130 - ALGOREX INC [US], et al
  • [A] SEOK JONG WON ET AL: "Speech enhancement with reduction of noise components in the wavelet domain", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, ICASSP. PART 2 (OF 5);MUNICH, GER APR 21-24 1997, vol. 2, 1997, ICASSP IEEE Int Conf Acoust Speech Signal Process Proc;ICASSP, IEEE International Conference on Acoustics, Speech and Signal Processing - Proceedings; Speech Processing 1997 IEEE, Piscataway, NJ, USA, pages 1323 - 1326, XP002170620
  • [A] LIANG J ET AL: "OUTPUT-BASED OBJECTIVE SPEECH QUALITY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. CONF. 44, 8 June 1994 (1994-06-08), pages 1719 - 1723, XP000497716, ISBN: 0-7803-1928-1
  • [A] HAUENSTEIN M ET AL: "INSTRUMENTELLE SPRACHGUETEBEURTEILUNG", FUNKSCHAU,DE,FRANZIS-VERLAG K.G. MUNCHEN, vol. 71, no. 3, 23 January 1998 (1998-01-23), pages 61 - 64, XP000765678, ISSN: 0016-2841

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244094 A1 20020925; AT 289109 T 20050215; DE 50202226 D1 20050317; EP 1386307 A1 20040204; EP 1386307 B1 20050209; EP 1386307 B2 20130417; US 2002191798 A1 20021219; US 6804651 B2 20041012; WO 02075725 A1 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI