Global Patent Index - EP 1244119 A1

EP 1244119 A1 2002-09-25 - Transformer or coil

Title (en)

Transformer or coil

Title (de)

Transformator oder Drossel

Title (fr)

Transformateur ou inductance

Publication

EP 1244119 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02090114 A

Priority

DE 10114750 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a ferromagnetic core with at least two legs, of which at least one carries at least one winding, two yokes joining the legs and at least one U-shaped fork (7) for mechanically fixing the core with the fork legs (9) laterally enclosing the two yokes and one arm of the core. The clamping fork's legs pass through the winding (6) or windings in the longitudinal direction of the winding(s).

Abstract (de)

Zum Verspannen der Kernelemente von Transformatoren oder Drosseln werden U-förmige Spannbügel (7) verwendet, deren Schenkel (9) die Wicklungen (6) des Transformators bzw. der Drossel parallel zu den Schenkeln (1,3) des Magnetkernes durchdringen. Sie sind dabei vorzugsweise in einem die Wick lungen aufnehmenden Spulenkörper geführt. Die Spannbügel werden unter Krafteinwirkung in an sich bekannter Weise am Magnetkern festgelegt. Durch die Verwendung mehrerer Spannbügel, die an verschiedener Stelle am Magnetkern angreifen, wird ein rüttelfester Aufbau des Magnetkernes mit einem Minimum an dafür erforderlichen Befestigungsmitteln gewährleistet. Das Volumen eines Transformators oder einer Drossel lässt sich trotz Verwendung von Spannbügeln beibehalten, wenn die Schenkel und Joche des Magnetkerns entsprechend flacher ausgestaltet werden; die magnetischen Feldlinien schließen sich nämlich auceh über die Spannbügelschenkel (9), so dass sich trotz Verminderung der Joch- und Schenkelhöhe des Magnetkerns dessen magnetischer Widerstand nicht oder nur unwesentlich ändert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 17/04; H01F 27/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/266 (2013.01); H01F 27/263 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244119 A1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040226

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI