Global Patent Index - EP 1244128 A2

EP 1244128 A2 2002-09-25 - Circuit breaker

Title (en)

Circuit breaker

Title (de)

Lastschalter

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur

Publication

EP 1244128 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01120748 A

Priority

JP 2001085013 A

Abstract (en)

A housing of a circuit breaker, which is satisfactory in impact resistance and can be applied to high breaking capacity use, and is satisfactory in flame retardancy and strength properties and exhibits less mottled blooming. The base of a circuit breaker includes 20 wt% of nylon 66, 9 wt% of nylon 6, 4 wt% of nylon 6T, 42 wt% of a glass fiber, 13 wt% of polybromostyrene, 4 wt% of antimony trioxide, 8 wt% of an ethylene/ alpha -olefin copolymer, and 0.3 wt% of carbon black. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/02; H01H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29B 11/16 (2006.01); C08K 3/00 (2006.01); C08K 5/00 (2006.01); C08L 23/08 (2006.01); C08L 77/00 (2006.01); H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 71/02 (2006.01); H01H 73/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/0257 (2013.01); H01H 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244128 A2 20020925; EP 1244128 A3 20040414; EP 1244128 B1 20070704; CN 1206689 C 20050615; CN 1377054 A 20021030; DE 60129201 D1 20070816; DE 60129201 T2 20080306; ES 2286063 T3 20071201; JP 2002289083 A 20021004; TW 517258 B 20030111

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110907

2013-06-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130605

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60129201

- Effective date: 20120403

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080407

2007-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2286063 T3

2007-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60129201 P 20070816

2007-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2007-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KATSUBE, SHUNICHI

2007-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUKUYA, KAZUNORI

2007-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAYASHI, MICHIHIRO

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2005-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2004-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI