Global Patent Index - EP 1244131 A1

EP 1244131 A1 2002-09-25 - Cathode ray tube

Title (en)

Cathode ray tube

Title (de)

Kathodenstrahlröhren

Title (fr)

Tube à rayons cathodique

Publication

EP 1244131 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01107095 A

Priority

EP 01107095 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a base body consisting of at least an image screen (4), a funnel body (3) and a parabolic region (2). The base body contains at least one preferred breakage point (9) in the form of a change in stiffness in the material of the base body. The preferred breakage point can be a narrowing in the cross-section of the material if the base body, e.g. a groove or perforation.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kathodenstrahlröhre mit einem Grundkörper, der zumindest von einem Bildschirm, einem Trichterkörper und einem Parabelbereich gebildet ist. Zur Verbesserung des Implosionsschutzes ist es erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, dass in den Grundkörper zumindest eine Sollbruchstelle eingebracht ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/87

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/87 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/87 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244131 A1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040311

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI