Global Patent Index - EP 1244136 A2

EP 1244136 A2 2002-09-25 - Material handling system and method for a multi-workpiece plasma treatment system

Title (en)

Material handling system and method for a multi-workpiece plasma treatment system

Title (de)

System zum Behandeln von Material und Verfahren für ein Plasmabehandlungssystem für mehrere Werkstücke

Title (fr)

Système de manipulation de matériaux et méthode pour un système multi-pièces de traitement au plasma

Publication

EP 1244136 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02006146 A

Priority

  • US 27771401 P
  • US 99887501 A

Abstract (en)

A plasma treatment system in which untreated workpieces are serially received one at a time on an infeed table but stored in parallel on the infeed table. The untreated workpieces are transferred simultaneously, in parallel, into a plasma treatment chamber. Thereafter, treated workpieces are transferred simultaneously, in parallel, out of the plasma treatment chamber onto an outfeed table; and the outfeed table serially discharges the treated workpieces one at a time from the outfeed table.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/00 (2006.01); H05H 1/46 (2006.01); C23C 14/56 (2006.01); C23C 16/54 (2006.01); H01L 21/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/205 (2006.01); H01L 21/3065 (2006.01); H01L 21/677 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/67069 (2013.01); H01J 37/32743 (2013.01); Y10S 414/139 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244136 A2 20020925; EP 1244136 A3 20060412; JP 2003037149 A 20030207; TW 571334 B 20040111; US 2002134310 A1 20020926; US 6841033 B2 20050111

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-04-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 21/00 20060101AFI20020429BHEP

2006-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C23C 16/54 20060101ALI20060220BHEP

2006-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C23C 14/56 20060101ALI20060220BHEP

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI