Global Patent Index - EP 1244174 A1

EP 1244174 A1 2002-09-25 - Mobile terminal with hole in patch antenna

Title (en)

Mobile terminal with hole in patch antenna

Title (de)

Mobiles Endgerät mit Öffnung in einer Streifenleiterantenne

Title (fr)

Terminal mobile avec une ouverture dans une antenne à plaque

Publication

EP 1244174 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01106944 A

Priority

EP 01106944 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a mobile terminal 1 for a wireless communication system, with a patch antenna 8 located internally of a casing 7 of the mobile terminal 1, an RF unit for processing RF signals received or to be transmitted, an RF connector 14 located underneath the patch antenna 8 and comprising a switch means for selectively connecting the RF unit to the patch antenna or to an external antenna, whereby the patch antenna 8 and said casing respectively comprise an opening aligned with the RF connector 14 enabling the connection of an external antenna connector 16 through the openings of the RF connector. The mobile terminal 1 according to the present invention can be built very small with a high integration of the respective components. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 9/30 (2006.01); H01Q 21/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/30 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0407 (2013.01); H01Q 21/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244174 A1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI