Global Patent Index - EP 1244187 A1

EP 1244187 A1 2002-09-25 - Hydraulic pressing device and method for operating the same

Title (en)

Hydraulic pressing device and method for operating the same

Title (de)

Hydraulisches Pressgerät und Verfahren zum Betreiben desselben

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pressage hydraulique et son procédé de fonctionnement

Publication

EP 1244187 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02000014 A

Priority

  • DE 19745483 A
  • DE 19825160 A
  • EP 98951524 A

Abstract (en)

The hydraulic press device (2) has a fixed part (26) and a movable part (24) which is moved with respect to the fixed part until a predefined pressure is reached. When the predefined pressure is reached the movable part is triggered to be automatically moved fully back to its initial position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Betreiben eines hydraulischen Verpreßgeräts, mit einem Festteil (26) und einem Bewegungsteil (24), wobei das Bewegungsteil (24) relativ zu dem Festteil (26) bis zum Erreichen eines vorbestimmten Druckes bewegt wird. Um ein Verfahren zum Betreiben eines hydraulischen Verpreßgeräts der in Rede stehenden Art, wie bspw. ein Kabelschuh- (Verbinder-) oder Nietwerkzeug-Verpreßgerät, anzugeben, welches insbesondere handhabungstechnisch verbessert ist, wird vorgeschlagen, daß ausgelöst durch Erreichen des vorbestimmten Druckes das Bewegungsteil (24) selbsttätig und vollständig in seine Ausgangsstellung zurückfährt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/042; B25B 27/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2006.01); B21J 15/20 (2006.01); B21J 15/26 (2006.01); B25B 27/10 (2006.01); B25F 5/00 (2006.01); H01R 43/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/10 (2013.01); B21D 39/04 (2013.01); B21J 15/20 (2013.01); B21J 15/26 (2013.01); B25F 5/005 (2013.01); H01R 43/0427 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19825160 A1 19990422; CH 0944937 H2 20160115; EP 1244187 A1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-26 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070821

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050531

2003-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-08-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 944937

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE