Global Patent Index - EP 1244334 A2

EP 1244334 A2 2002-09-25 - Circuit for a LED light source

Title (en)

Circuit for a LED light source

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung für eine LED Leuchte

Title (fr)

Circuit pour une source lumineuse à diodes électroluminescentes

Publication

EP 1244334 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005598 A

Priority

DE 10114124 A

Abstract (en)

The circuit has a light (1) with 2 connection lines whose light source (2) has at least one LED, an adjustable current source for supplying the light via the connection lines, a coding element (3) parallel to the LED light source whose coding represents the rated current of the light source and an evaluation circuit (6) outside the light that evaluates the coding and sets the current source to the rated current of the LED light source accordingly.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Schaltungsanordnung bestehend aus einer Leuchte (1) mit zwei Anschlussleitungen (Anschlusskontakten), dessen Lichtquelle (2) mindestens eine Leuchtdiode (LED) aufweist, und einer einstellbare Stromquelle (8) zur Stromversorgung der Leuchte über die Anschlussleitungen (14,15). Dabei ist die Schaltungsanordnung gekennzeichnet durch ein in der Leuchte (1) im Stromkreis parallel zur LED-Lichtquelle (2) angeordnetes Codierelement (3), dessen Codierung den Nennstrom der LED-Lichtquelle (2) repräsentiert, eine außerhalb der Leuchte (1) angeordnete Auswerteschaltung (6), die mit mindestens einer Anschlussleitung (14,15) der Leuchte (1) verbunden ist, wobei die Auswerteschaltung (6) die Codierung des Codierelements (3) auswertet und anhand der so ermittelten Codierung die regelbare Stromquelle (8) auf den Nennstrom der LED-Lichtquelle (2) eingestellt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 33/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/0848 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0896899 A2 19990217 - REITTER & SCHEFENACKER GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1244334 A2 20020925; EP 1244334 A3 20050427; DE 10114124 A1 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060822

2006-02-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOODRICH LIGHTING SYSTEMS GMBH

2006-01-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-02-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOODRICH HELLA AEROSPACE LIGHTING SYSTEMS GMBH

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI