Global Patent Index - EP 1245524 A3

EP 1245524 A3 2004-12-29 - Shelf stacking machine

Title (en)

Shelf stacking machine

Title (de)

Regalfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Gerbeur

Publication

EP 1245524 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02006956 A

Priority

  • DE 20108637 U
  • DE 20105388 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1245524A2] The device for centered accommodation of an object with a cylindrical locating surface (6,15,16), such as a large paper roll, has two parallel spaced legs (1,2) with inclined accommodation surfaces (4,5) facing each other. At least one of the accommodation legs in the area of the accommodation surfaces has movable devices (8,9) for reduction of friction, which favors an automatic centering of an object through its own weight. The accommodation device is a telescopically movable fork of a fork lift, shelf or transport vehicle. The friction reduction devices comprise at least one rotatably located roller or at least one rotatably located ball. The surfaces of the rollers or balls are coated with a soft, shock-absorbing material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/07; B65G 1/04; B66F 9/075

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/12 (2006.01); B66F 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/126 (2013.01); B66F 9/18 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4172 (2013.01); B65H 2402/343 (2013.01); B65H 2405/422 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1245524 A2 20021002; EP 1245524 A3 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WESTFALIA LOGISTICS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI