Global Patent Index - EP 1245529 A3

EP 1245529 A3 2002-12-18 - Microminiature movable device

Title (en)

Microminiature movable device

Title (de)

Bewegliches Mikrominiaturbauelement

Title (fr)

Dispositif microminiature mobile

Publication

EP 1245529 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02006542 A

Priority

JP 2001095841 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1245529A2] On the top of a central protrusion 81 of a stationary electrode substrate 80 there is formed a stationary electrode 84A. A movable electrode plate 12 is supported at both sides thereof to a support frame 10 through flexures 19 and anchor parts 11. The movable electrode plate 12 is held displaceable vertically to the stationary electrode 12. The marginal edge of the protrusion 81 merges into a sloping face, on which an auxiliary electrode 84B is formed. In the case of separating the movable electrode plate 12 from the stationary electrode 84a, a voltage is applied between them. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B81B 3/00; G02B 26/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B81B 3/00 (2006.01); G02B 26/08 (2006.01); B81C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 26/0841 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XAY] US 5551293 A 19960903 - BOYSEL ROBERT M [US], et al
  • [YA] EP 0419853 A2 19910403 - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]
  • [XA] EP 0725408 A2 19960807 - MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 11 30 September 1998 (1998-09-30)
  • [A] KATO Y ET AL: "Development of 4*4 MEMS optical switch", 2000 IEEE/LEOS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL MEMS (CAT. NO.00EX399), 2000 IEEE/LEOS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL MEMS, KAUAI, HI, USA, 21-24 AUG. 2000, 2000, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 95 - 96, XP010518554, ISBN: 0-7803-6257-8

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1245529 A2 20021002; EP 1245529 A3 20021218; JP 2002296516 A 20021009; JP 3557525 B2 20040825; US 2002141038 A1 20021003; US 6603591 B2 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB LI

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI