Global Patent Index - EP 1245783 A3

EP 1245783 A3 2002-12-04 - Apparatus and method for directional drilling using coiled tubing

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for directional drilling using coiled tubing

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Richtbohren mit gewickeltem Rohrstrang

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le forage dirigé utilisant un tubage enroulé

Publication

EP 1245783 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02076823 A

Priority

  • EP 97300719 A
  • US 1126896 P
  • US 78371197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1245783A2] A steerable directional drilling tool assembly includes a bent housing (12) defining a bend angle and having a mud motor (13) in its upper section and a drill bit (15) below its lower section, an orienting tool (17) rotatably coupled to such upper section and suspended on coiled tubing (20) that extends upward to the surface, an electric motor in the orienting tool operable to rotate the bent housing in either hand direction to change or adjust the tool face angle of the bit, or continuously rotate the bent housing so that the bit drills straight-ahead, and an electric cable extending throughout the coiled tubing to furnish power from the surface to the electric motor and transmit electric signals to and from the surface. A logging tool can be included in the assembly for measuring characteristics of the formation, the borehole, and the tool assembly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/067 (2013.01); E21B 7/068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1245783 A2 20021002; EP 1245783 A3 20021204

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140829

2013-08-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1051886

2008-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080408

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-10-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 787886

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL