Global Patent Index - EP 1246154 A3

EP 1246154 A3 2002-11-20 - Circuit for driving of lighting elements, especially for use with encoding switches

Title (en)

Circuit for driving of lighting elements, especially for use with encoding switches

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung von Leuchtelementen, insbesondere zur Verwendung mit Kodierschaltern

Title (fr)

Circuit de commande pour eléments d'éclairage, utile en particulier avec des commutateurs de codage

Publication

EP 1246154 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01129897 A

Priority

DE 20105599 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1246154A2] A group of light emitting diode (LED) elements are connected in series between an AC power supply (N-L1) with a resistor (R) and rectifier diode (D1). The diodes are physically arrayed to create a seven segment display element. The activation of elements is controlled by coupling to a coding switch, that short circuits selected elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20105599 U1 20010802; EP 1246154 A2 20021002; EP 1246154 A3 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040319

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI