Global Patent Index - EP 1246209 A3

EP 1246209 A3 2002-12-18 - Ferromagnetic-metal-based powder, powder core using the same, and manufacturing method for ferromagnetic-metal-based powder

Title (en)

Ferromagnetic-metal-based powder, powder core using the same, and manufacturing method for ferromagnetic-metal-based powder

Title (de)

Ferromagnetisches Metall-Pulver, Kern mit diesem Pulver und Herstellungsverfahren für dieses Pulver

Title (fr)

Poudre à base d'un métal ferromagnétique, noyau de poudre l'utilisant et méthode de fabrication de cette poudre

Publication

EP 1246209 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02006902 A

Priority

  • JP 2001090884 A
  • JP 2001172529 A
  • JP 2001364658 A
  • JP 2002030142 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1246209A2] An iron-based powder including a heat-resistant insulate coating and a powder core are suggested. A paint containing silicone resin and pigment is added to a raw material powder primarily containing a ferromagnetic metal, especially, iron, agitation and mixing are performed and, thereafter, a drying treatment is performed so as to form a coating containing silicone resin and pigment on the surface of the iron-based powder. The ratio of the silicone resin content to the pigment content in the coating is preferably 0.01 or more, but less than 4.0 on a mass basis. The pigment is preferably at least one selected from the group consisting of metal oxides, metal nitrides, metal carbides, minerals, and glass. The paint may be sprayed to the iron-based powder in a fluidized state. A coating containing at least one of Si compounds, Ti compounds, Zr compounds, P compounds, and Cr compounds may be formed as a lower layer of the aforementioned coating. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/26; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/24 (2006.01); H01F 1/26 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/0246 (2013.01); H01F 1/24 (2013.01); H01F 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1246209 A2 20021002; EP 1246209 A3 20021218; EP 1246209 B1 20061025; CA 2378417 A1 20020927; CA 2378417 C 20091124; CN 1381852 A 20021127; DE 60215570 D1 20061207

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-11-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130312

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070726

2007-02-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-01-26 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070126

2006-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60215570 P 20061207

2006-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE SE

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JFE STEEL CORPORATION

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE SE

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021227

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI