Global Patent Index - EP 1246304 A3

EP 1246304 A3 2003-06-25 - Coaxial connector

Title (en)

Coaxial connector

Title (de)

Koaxial-Steckerteil

Title (fr)

Connecteur coaxial

Publication

EP 1246304 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02005377 A

Priority

DE 10115479 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1246304A2] A coaxial plug-in part has a casing (10), an inner contact (18), an outer contact (16) and an insulator (20) fitted between the inner and outer contacts. The outer contact swivels on the casing. The insulator held in the outer contact and the inner contact held in the insulator swivel as a contact unit (12,14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05; H01R 13/631; H01R 13/646

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/02 (2006.01); H01R 13/62 (2006.01); H01R 13/631 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6315 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1246304 A2 20021002; EP 1246304 A3 20030625; EP 1246304 B1 20050907; CA 2377275 A1 20020929; CA 2377275 C 20061010; CN 1170344 C 20041006; CN 1379512 A 20021113; DE 10115479 A1 20021010; DE 50204142 D1 20051013; JP 2002298996 A 20021011; JP 3683541 B2 20050817; KR 100480215 B1 20050406; KR 20020077100 A 20021011; US 2002142625 A1 20021003; US 6705875 B2 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170307

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRONICS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HARTING ELECTRONICS GMBH & CO. KG, 32339 ESPELKAMP, DE

- Document: DE 50204142

2016-09-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50204142

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130315

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130315

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-29 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2006-11-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-10-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-10-06 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2005-12-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-11-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204142 P 20051013

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2004-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRONICS GMBH & CO. KG

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040213

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030909

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 9/05 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/631 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/646 B

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI