Global Patent Index - EP 1246315 A3

EP 1246315 A3 2003-06-25 - Electrical connector with adjustable coding means

Title (en)

Electrical connector with adjustable coding means

Title (de)

Elektrische Steckverbindung mit einer einstellbaren Kodierung

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique avec dispositif de codage ajustable

Publication

EP 1246315 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02004833 A

Priority

DE 20105677 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1246315A2] The electrical connector has two parts (5,6) that are pulled together by a lever operation. A cover sits on top (3). A label (7) is fixed securely to the connector and this provides coding that identifies the connection use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/46 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01); H01R 13/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/465 (2013.01); H01R 13/62933 (2013.01); H01R 13/64 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20105677 U1 20020801; EP 1246315 A2 20021002; EP 1246315 A3 20030625; JP 3088988 U 20021004; US 2002177355 A1 20021128; US 6746271 B2 20040608

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060722

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040611

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/46 A

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI