Global Patent Index - EP 1246952 A4

EP 1246952 A4 2004-12-08 - COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR TREATING METALS

Title (en)

COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR TREATING METALS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON METALLEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES METAUX

Publication

EP 1246952 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00975346 A

Priority

  • US 0029266 W
  • US 16245599 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0132952A1] A chromium free conversion coating at least equivalent in corrosion protective quality to conventional chromate conversion coatings can be formed on metals, particularly cold rolled steel, by a dry-in-place aqueous acidic liquid that preferably has a pH value between 0.5 and 5.0 and comprises: (A) "fluorometallate" anions consisting of (i) at least four fluorine atoms, (ii) at least one atom of an element selected from the group consisting of titanium, zirconium, hafnium, silicon, aluminum, and boron, and, optionally, one or more of (iii) ionizable hydrogen atoms and (iv) oxygen atoms; (B) a component of divalent or tetravalent cations of elements selected from the group consisting of cobalt, magnesium, manganese, zinc, nickel, tin, copper, zirconium, iron, and strontium in such an amount that the ratio of the total number of cations of this component to the number of anions in component (A) is at least about 1:5 but not greater than about 3:1; (C) a component selected from the group consisting of phosphorus-containing inorganic oxyanions and phosphonate anions; and (D) a component of polymers of hydroxy styrene, modified by substitution on the aromatic rings of the polymers of substituted aminomethyl moieties, in which the substituents (other than the carbon atom that is directly bonded to an aromatic ring in the polymer) on the amino nitrogen atom jointly contain at least two carbon atoms and at least one hydroxy moiety but neither of these substituents on the amino nitrogen atom individually contains more than half as many hydroxyl moieties as it has carbon atoms, unless it contains only one carbon atom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 22/00; C23C 22/34; C23C 22/36; C23C 22/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/34 (2006.01); C23C 22/36 (2006.01); C23C 22/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/36 (2013.01); C23C 22/34 (2013.01); C23C 22/364 (2013.01); C23C 22/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 0132952A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0132952 A1 20010510; AU 1341001 A 20010514; CA 2389343 A1 20010510; DE 60042842 D1 20091008; EP 1246952 A1 20021009; EP 1246952 A4 20041208; EP 1246952 B1 20090826; ES 2334489 T3 20100311; TW 541353 B 20030711

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121025

2014-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140527

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121024

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60042842

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100527

2010-03-11 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2334489 T3

2009-10-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60042842 P 20091008

2009-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-08-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2008-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070917

2007-10-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

2004-12-08 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041025

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 22/00 A

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 22/34 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 22/36 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 22/50 B

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL CORPORATION

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI