Global Patent Index - EP 1247227 A4

EP 1247227 A4 2003-06-25 - SELLING A DIGITAL CONTENT PRODUCT IN AN ONLINE TRANSACTION

Title (en)

SELLING A DIGITAL CONTENT PRODUCT IN AN ONLINE TRANSACTION

Title (de)

VERKAUF EINES PRODUKTES MIT DIGITALEM INHALT IN EINER ONLINE TRANSAKTION

Title (fr)

VENTE D'UN PRODUIT A TENEUR NUMERIQUE DANS UNE TRANSACTION EN LIGNE

Publication

EP 1247227 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00988222 A

Priority

  • US 0034704 W
  • US 47432799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0148658A1] A method for selling a digital content product (206) in an online commercial transaction includes the steps of encoding the digital content product; creating a digital file (180) including a header (202) having first information about the digital content product, a product preview (204) that is a portion of the digital content product that is not encoded, and the encoded digital content product; storing, as a product for sale, the digital file at a host computer (110, 112); and providing access to the host computer by a buyer computer so that the buyer computer has access to the digital file. A system implements the method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60; G06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0798892 A2 19971001 - IBM [US]
  • [X] US 5509070 A 19960416 - SCHULL JONATHAN [US]
  • [X] US 5845281 A 19981201 - BENSON GREG [SE], et al
  • [X] US 5933498 A 19990803 - SCHNECK PAUL B [US], et al
  • [E] US 6473740 B2 20021029 - COCKRILL MICHAEL P [US], et al
  • [A] TODD WOODY: "Fight for your rights", THE STANDARD (INTERNET), 7 June 1999 (1999-06-07), XP002153035, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://thestandard.com/article/display/0,1151,4793,00.html> [retrieved on 20001116]
  • [A] CHOUDHURY A K ET AL: "COPYRIGHT PROTECTION FOR ELECTRONIC PUBLISHING OVER COMPUTER NETWORKS", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, vol. 9, no. 3, 1 May 1995 (1995-05-01), pages 12 - 20, XP000505280, ISSN: 0890-8044
  • [A] BAKER: "In the money - QPass has big hopes for small Net sales", BUSINESS JOURNAL (INTERNET), 12 October 1998 (1998-10-12), XP002134402, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:www.amcity.com/seattle/stories/1998/10/12/story3.html> [retrieved on 20000330]
  • See also references of WO 0148658A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0148658 A1 20010705; AU 2445101 A 20010709; CA 2395719 A1 20010705; EP 1247227 A1 20021009; EP 1247227 A4 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050811

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 17/60 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 1/00 B

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI