Global Patent Index - EP 1247310 B1

EP 1247310 B1 2003-06-18 - RADIO TRANSMITTER/RADIO RECEIVER UNIT COMPRISING A TUNEABLE ANTENNA

Title (en)

RADIO TRANSMITTER/RADIO RECEIVER UNIT COMPRISING A TUNEABLE ANTENNA

Title (de)

FUNK-SENDE-/FUNK-EMPFANGSEINRICHTUNG MIT ABSTIMMBARER ANTENNE

Title (fr)

UNITE D'EMISSION/DE RECEPTION RADIO A ANTENNE ACCORDABLE

Publication

EP 1247310 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00989808 A

Priority

  • DE 0004225 W
  • DE 19959983 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145203A1] The invention relates to a radio transmitter/radio receiver unit which is capable of transmitting and receiving in different frequency ranges with a stable antenna gain that remains practically constant. According to the invention, a dielectric body, whose dielectricity can be modified is placed in the vicinity of an antenna body. A control unit supplies a d.c. voltage to the antenna which causes the dielectricity of the dielectric body to be modified. The control unit modifies the d.c. voltage value until the dielectricity guarantees an optimum value for at least one physical input variable, which represents the reception and transmission quality.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/44; H01Q 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/44 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 9/30 (2006.01); H01Q 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/14 (2013.01); H01Q 3/44 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0442 (2013.01); H01Q 9/30 (2013.01); H01Q 9/32 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145203 A1 20010621; AT 243371 T 20030715; CN 1210840 C 20050713; CN 1421058 A 20030528; DE 19959983 A1 20010705; DE 19959983 C2 20020502; EP 1247310 A1 20021009; EP 1247310 B1 20030618; US 6781562 B1 20040824

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002621

- Representative's name: MAUCHER JENKINS, DE

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161017

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-06-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140508 AND 20140514

2014-04-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO., L.P., HOUSTON, US

- Document: DE 50002621

- Effective date: 20140307

2014-04-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, SAN DIEGO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P., HOUSTON, TEX., US

- Document: DE 50002621

- Effective date: 20140307

2014-04-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002621

- Representative's name: SAMSON & PARTNER, PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140307

2014-04-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002621

- Representative's name: SAMSON & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140307

2014-04-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002621

- Representative's name: MAUCHER JENKINS, DE

- Effective date: 20140307

2014-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002621

- Representative's name: SAMSON & PARTNER, PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, SAN DIEGO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PALM, INC. (N.D.GES. D. STAATES DELAWARE), SUNNYVALE, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 50002621

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-05-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110407 AND 20110413

2010-09-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100826 AND 20100901

2010-09-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100812 AND 20100818

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081129

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-07-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080505

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002621 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LUNGWITZ, MATTHIAS

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020429

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI