Global Patent Index - EP 1247430 B1

EP 1247430 B1 2007-10-03 - DEVICE FOR HEATING AIR, FLUIDS AND MATERIALS, IN DRY OR WET ENVIRONMENT, POWERED WITH LOW VOLTAGE CURRENT OR ALTERNATING OR DIRECT VERY LOW SAFE ALLOWABLE VOLTAGE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR HEATING AIR, FLUIDS AND MATERIALS, IN DRY OR WET ENVIRONMENT, POWERED WITH LOW VOLTAGE CURRENT OR ALTERNATING OR DIRECT VERY LOW SAFE ALLOWABLE VOLTAGE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR HEIZUNG VON LUFT, VON FLÜSSIGEN MATERIALIEN UND MATERIALIEN IN FEUCHTER ODER TROCKENER UMGEBUNG, DIE DURCH NIEDER-, WECHSEL- ODER GLEICHSPANNUNG VERSORGT WIRD

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE DE L'AIR, DE FLUIDES ET DES MAT RIAUX, EN MILIEU SEC OU HUMIDE, ALIMENT EN COURANT BASSE TENSION OU TBTS ALTERNATIF OU CONTINU

Publication

EP 1247430 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00988925 A

Priority

  • FR 0003547 W
  • FR 9916108 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145465A1] The invention concerns a device for heating air, fluids and materials, in dry or wet environment powered in low voltage current or alternating or direct very low safe allowable voltage. The invention concerns a device for increasing the temperature of any type of surface, whether flat or embossed, solid or open-work, consisting of electrodes coated with a layer of electrically resistant fluid or pasty substance. The assembly of devices is very thin (about 1 millimetre). The inventive device is particularly designed for heating premises, swimming pools, pipes exposed to freezing, containers for warm food.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/60 (2006.01); H05B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/60 (2013.01); H05B 3/0004 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145465 A1 20010621; WO 0145465 A8 20010712; AT 375074 T 20071015; AU 2526701 A 20010625; DE 60036644 D1 20071115; DE 60036644 T2 20080724; DK 1247430 T3 20080204; EP 1247430 A1 20021009; EP 1247430 B1 20071003; ES 2295077 T3 20080416; FR 2802761 A1 20010622; FR 2802761 B1 20020308; PT 1247430 E 20080212; US 2003000941 A1 20030102; US 6963054 B2 20051108

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131214

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131214

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131214

2014-10-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60036644

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-08-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131214

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131215

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131214

2014-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 375074 T

- Effective date: 20131214

2014-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-07-21 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60036644

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130102

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20121218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20121218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20121224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101214

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091215

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110614

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110314

2011-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-06-22 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110614

2011-03-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110325

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-03-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20091214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20091231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071003

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071003

2009-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: COURAUD, JEAN-CLAUDE

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TOURN, JEAN-CLAUDE

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080104

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071003

2008-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2295077 T3

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071207

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-12 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080103

2008-02-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-02-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: COURAUD, JEAN-CLAUDE

- Effective date: 20071128

2008-01-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071219

2007-11-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: COURAUD, JEAN-CLAUDE

2007-11-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TOURN, JEAN-CLAUDE

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60036644 P 20071115

2007-11-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2007-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-10-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COURAUD, JEAN-CLAUDE - SOCIETE THERMIBAND LA PLAIN

2005-04-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COURAUD, JEAN-CLAUDE

2005-04-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOURN, JEAN-CLAUDE

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COURAUD, JEAN-CLAUDE

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOURN, JEAN-CLAUDE

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COURAUD, JEAN-CLAUDE

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOURN, JEAN-CLAUDE

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COURAUD, JEAN-CLAUDE

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOURN, JEAN-CLAUDE

2004-08-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COURAUD, JEAN-CLAUDE

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI