Global Patent Index - EP 1247978 B1

EP 1247978 B1 2004-12-29 - Fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzsystem für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de carburant pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1247978 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02007620 A

Priority

DE 10117401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1247978A2] The fuel injection system is for a diesel engine. It has a number of fuel injectors (1) supplied via a high pressure fuel line (13) containing a pressure control valve (26) for controlling the pressure during fuel injection. The pressure control valve has a freely sliding piston (30) with a pressure space (36,38) on either side and a slider (32) inserted in the flow path of the high pressure fuel line, for controlling the flow cross-section, a setting valve (14,16) determining the pressure in one or both pressure spaces, for moving the piston in the opening or closing direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 63/00; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0007 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1247978 A2 20021009; EP 1247978 A3 20040114; EP 1247978 B1 20041229; AT 286207 T 20050115; DE 10117401 A1 20021017; DE 10117401 C2 20030227; US 2002179063 A1 20021205; US 6729302 B2 20040504

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070404

2006-04-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-04-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-04-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-11-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201867 P 20050203

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 A

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 63/00 B

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 63/02 B

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI