Global Patent Index - EP 1249310 A3

EP 1249310 A3 2003-06-11 - Holding disc for flap grinding wheel

Title (en)

Holding disc for flap grinding wheel

Title (de)

Trägerteller für Lamellenschleifscheiben

Title (fr)

Disque support pour meule à lamelles

Publication

EP 1249310 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01122040 A

Priority

DE 20106228 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2361269A1] The abrasive flap wheel (1) has a backing plate (2) which comprises a sunk inner part (3) and an outer flange (4). The sunk inner part (3) has a hub (7) which projects toward the front side (3a), i.e. toward the side of the abrasive flaps, and is provided with a location hole (8) and an internal thread (9). The internal thread (9) serves to fasten the abrasive flap wheel to a corresponding driving machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 13/16; B24D 9/08; B24D 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 45/00 (2006.01); B24D 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 9/08 (2013.01); B24B 45/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20106228 U1 20010628; AT 294049 T 20050515; CA 2361269 A1 20021009; CA 2361269 C 20051025; EP 1249310 A2 20021016; EP 1249310 A3 20030611; EP 1249310 B1 20050427; ES 2181610 T1 20030301; US 2002146974 A1 20021010; US 6712683 B2 20040330

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150913

2016-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 294049 T

- Effective date: 20150913

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150913

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106031

- Representative's name: GERHARD GUSTORF, DE

2011-10-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106031

- Representative's name: GUSTORF, GERHARD, DIPL.-ING., DE

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2005-08-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050807

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106031 P 20050602

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040521

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24D 13/16 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24D 13/20 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24D 9/08 B

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI