Global Patent Index - EP 1249555 A3

EP 1249555 A3 2002-11-20 - Roof assemblies

Title (en)

Roof assemblies

Title (de)

Dachanordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de toiture

Publication

EP 1249555 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02077537 A

Priority

  • EP 97301513 A
  • GB 9605057 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0794297A1] A roof assembly for hipped conservatory roof comprises a ridge end (14), having a rim (22) to which glazing bars (26) are secured via intermediate connectors (28) that clamp onto the rim. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 3/08; E04B 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/02 (2006.01); E04B 7/06 (2006.01); E04D 3/06 (2006.01); E04D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/028 (2013.01); E04B 7/06 (2013.01); E04B 7/063 (2013.01); E04D 3/06 (2013.01); E04D 3/08 (2013.01); E04B 2007/066 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0875 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0794297 A1 19970910; EP 0794297 B1 20030514; AT 240443 T 20030515; AT 248267 T 20030915; AT 305068 T 20051015; DE 69721868 D1 20030618; DE 69721868 T2 20040506; DE 69724480 D1 20031002; DE 69724480 T2 20040311; DE 69734252 D1 20060202; DE 69734252 T2 20060622; DE 794297 T1 19990602; DK 0794297 T3 20030915; DK 1249555 T3 20031222; EP 1249555 A2 20021016; EP 1249555 A3 20021120; EP 1249555 B1 20030827; EP 1254995 A2 20021106; EP 1254995 A3 20021120; EP 1254995 A9 20030115; EP 1254995 B1 20050921; ES 2197302 T3 20040101; ES 2204882 T3 20040501; GB 2310869 A 19970910; GB 2310869 B 20000510; GB 2337778 A 19991201; GB 2337778 B 20000510; GB 9605057 D0 19960508; GB 9704658 D0 19970423; GB 9920220 D0 19991027

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-31 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2006-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050927

2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-07 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050927

2006-06-07 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20050927

2006-04-12 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060412

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060406

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-12-28 [REG GB 728Y] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION ALLOWED (SECT. 28/1977)

2005-11-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-02 [REG GB 728V] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION FILED (SECT. 28/1977)

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SYNSEAL EXTRUSIONS LIMITED

2004-07-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SYNSEAL EXTRUSIONS LIMITED

- Effective date: 20040521

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204882 T3

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040306

2004-03-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040306

2004-01-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040127

2003-12-22 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-11-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69724480 P 20031002

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0794297 P

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-10-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 794297

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE