Global Patent Index - EP 1250205 B1

EP 1250205 B1 2003-06-25 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ANGULAR, STAINLESS SHOT-BLASTING ABRASIVES BASED ON AN FE-CR-C ALLOY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING ANGULAR, STAINLESS SHOT-BLASTING ABRASIVES BASED ON AN FE-CR-C ALLOY

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN KANTIGES, ROSTFREIES STRAHLMITTEL AUF BASIS EINER FE-CR-C-LEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN AGENT DE GRENAILLAGE ANGULEUX INOXYDABLE A BASE D'UN ALLIAGE FE-CR-C

Publication

EP 1250205 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01942587 A

Priority

  • DE 10002738 A
  • EP 0100252 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0153022A1] The invention relates to a method for producing rust-resistant, angular shot-blasting abrasives (>60HRC) based on a Fe-Cr-C alloy. According to said method, a granulate consisting of an iron-chrome-carbon alloy is tempered to >60 HRC by subjecting it to a thermal treatment of greater than 900 DEG Celsius in a reduced atmosphere. A stainless, hard material which can be reduced to angular granules is thus produced. This results in shot-blasting abrasives with excellent characteristics for treating the surface of workpieces consisting of stainless material, e.g. stainless steel, non-ferrous metal and natural stone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 11/00 (2006.01); B22F 1/00 (2006.01); B22F 9/04 (2006.01); B22F 9/08 (2006.01); C09K 3/14 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/18 (2006.01); C22C 38/36 (2006.01); C21D 1/76 (2006.01); C21D 6/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/36 (2013.01); B22F 1/0085 (2013.01); C21D 9/0068 (2013.01); C22C 33/0285 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); B22F 2998/10 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01); C21D 1/76 (2013.01); C21D 6/002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/00 + B24C 11/00
  2. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 9/08 + B22F 9/04 + B22F 1/0085
  3. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 1/0085 + B22F 2201/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0153022 A1 20010726; AT 243594 T 20030715; AU 2846301 A 20010731; AU 769520 B2 20040129; BR 0107685 A 20021119; CA 2397953 A1 20010726; CA 2397953 C 20091110; CN 1245269 C 20060315; CN 1422194 A 20030604; CZ 20022532 A3 20030115; CZ 296109 B6 20060111; DE 10002738 A1 20010726; DK 1250205 T3 20030929; EA 003956 B1 20031030; EA 200200784 A1 20030227; EP 1250205 A1 20021023; EP 1250205 B1 20030625; ES 2202290 T3 20040401; JP 2003524690 A 20030819; JP 5085826 B2 20121128; NZ 520233 A 20041224; PT 1250205 E 20031128; SI 20913 A 20021231; UA 73545 C2 20020916; US 2003136224 A1 20030724; US 6764557 B2 20040720; ZA 200205764 B 20031104

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-26 [REG DE R074] RE-ESTABLISHMENT ALLOWED

- Document: DE 50100333

2011-10-26 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 50100333

2011-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50100333

2011-08-02 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 50100333

2006-09-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060711

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060711

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-10-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: VULKAN INOX GMBH

2005-08-12 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-02-02 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050202

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202290 T3

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2003-10-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100333 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI