Global Patent Index - EP 1251194 B8

EP 1251194 B8 2010-02-17 - Improved programming device for rotary dobbies of weaving machines

Title (en)

Improved programming device for rotary dobbies of weaving machines

Title (de)

Verbesserte Vorrichtung zum Programmieren von Rotationsschaftmaschinen in Webstühlen

Title (fr)

Dispositif amélioré pour la programmation des ratières rotatives dans les métiers à tisser

Publication

EP 1251194 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 02006721 A

Priority

IT MI20010670 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1251194A1] Device to carry out the programming of rotary dobbies for the operation of heald frames in weaving machines, particularly looms, of the type in which the control rods (3) for the heald frames are operated by connecting rods (2), and comprising a toggle-joint lever (14) controlled so as to oscillate about a fixed fulcrum (14E) to cause the operation of said device. According to the invention, the controls to cause the oscillation of the toggle-joint lever (14) are obtained, in coordination with the rotation of the main shaft (1) of the loom and against the action of a spring (15), by means of an electric linear stepping motor (16) in which the rectilinear driving member (16A) operates, by means of a link (17), on a rod (18) having one end (19) pivoted close to an end of the toggle-joint lever (14) and the other end (20) guided by a cam profile (21, 22). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 1/00 (2006.01); F16D 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1251194 A1 20021023; EP 1251194 B1 20091230; EP 1251194 B8 20100217; DE 60234890 D1 20100211; IT MI20010670 A1 20020930; IT MI20010670 D0 20010329

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130322

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60234890

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PROMATECH S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110310

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-02-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60234890 P 20100211

2010-01-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PROMATECH S.P.A.

2009-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2008-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080829

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: F.I.R.S.T. S.P.A.

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030409

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI