Global Patent Index - EP 1251205 A3

EP 1251205 A3 2003-06-04 - Device for removing the ballast from a trailway track

Title (en)

Device for removing the ballast from a trailway track

Title (de)

Abstreifvorrichtung zum Abstreifen von Schotter eines Gleises

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enlever le ballast d' une voie ferrée

Publication

EP 1251205 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02450057 A

Priority

AT 2982001 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002148379A1] A stripping apparatus is associated with a track maintenance machine having a machine frame mobile on a track comprised of rails fastened to ties. The stripping apparatus is designed for stripping off ballast lying on the ties and includes a supporting beam, which is mounted for vertical adjustment on the machine frame, and a plurality of elastic sweeping elements, which are disposed in a substantially vertical position. The sweeping elements are fastened at their upper ends to the supporting beam and are arranged adjacent to one another in a sweeping plane extending perpendicularly to the direction of longitudinal extension of the track. Two support rollers fastened to the supporting beam are provided for riding on the rails of the track.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 27/04; E01B 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/02 (2006.01); E01B 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/04 (2013.01); E01B 27/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2002148379 A1 20021017; US 6581526 B2 20030624; AT 4461 U2 20010725; AT 4461 U3 20020325; CN 1180165 C 20041215; CN 1381648 A 20021127; EP 1251205 A2 20021023; EP 1251205 A3 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040429

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040212

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01B 27/04 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01B 27/02 B

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI