Global Patent Index - EP 1252578 A4

EP 1252578 A4 2003-06-04 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS TO MANAGE AND TRACK THE STATES OF ELECTRONIC MEDIA

Title (en)

METHODS AND SYSTEMS TO MANAGE AND TRACK THE STATES OF ELECTRONIC MEDIA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG UND VERFOLGUNG DES ZUSTANDES VON ELEKTRONISCHEN MEDIA

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES DE GESTION ET DE TRACAGE D'ETATS DE SUPPORTS ELECTRONIQUES

Publication

EP 1252578 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01942433 A

Priority

  • US 0101088 W
  • US 17623000 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2396371A1] Method and systems are described which can be used to track and manage the states of electronic media (200) in a communication network (5). The electronic medium (200) can be restored, archived and used to create new electronic media. Moreover, the electronic medium can be superseded and deleted. Additionally, notification processes can be used to prioritize and emphasize certain portions of the electronic medium (200). Access to the electronic medium may also be blocked or limited to certain recipients (1-4) of the medium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 15/163 (2006.01); G06F 15/177 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 5706452 A 19980106 - IVANOV VLADIMIR I [US]
  • [Y] US 5978836 A 19991102 - OUCHI NORMAN KEN [US]
  • [A] US 5937160 A 19990810 - DAVIS JASON O'NEAL [US], et al
  • [A] PITKOW J E ET AL: "Towards an intelligent publishing environment", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 27, no. 6, 1 April 1995 (1995-04-01), pages 729 - 737, XP004013175, ISSN: 0169-7552
  • See also references of WO 0152081A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

AU 2941801 A 20010724; CA 2396371 A1 20010719; CA 2396371 C 20060725; EP 1252578 A1 20021030; EP 1252578 A4 20030604; JP 2003519873 A 20030624

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060527

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-06-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 17/30 A

2002-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI