Global Patent Index - EP 1252944 A3

EP 1252944 A3 2002-11-20 - Heddle and method of producing a heddle

Title (en)

Heddle and method of producing a heddle

Title (de)

Weblitze und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Weblitze

Title (fr)

Lisse et procédé de fabrication d'une lisse

Publication

EP 1252944 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02002314 A

Priority

CH 3702001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1252944A2] The integral blank (1) includes an outline having two bulged portions (4a,4b) and a center narrow portion (2). The top corner area near the narrow portion, is rounded or flattened, having an angular aperture of 20-120 degrees . A loop is formed between two separate stands of blank, along the narrow portion. <??>An additional tension-thread-guard is inserted in loop enclosed by blank strands that are notched at outer side contour line. The blank of dumbbell-shape or double-arched roof type is obtained by cold rolling of spring materials, cut-off wire or steel springs. The tensile strength of blank is 900N/mm<2>-2500N/mm<2> or 1100N/mm<2>-1500N/mm<2>. The edge portion of cores fastening edged loop or integral molding edged loop, is straight. The radius of curvature (R1) at outline area of narrow portion is 0.1-0.5mm. The width (b1) of outline of blank is 2.6mm, while the width of (b2) of narrow portions is 0.6mm. An Independent claim is included for a method of manufacture of heddle which involves inserting an additional tension-thread-guard into a loop by one-touch, and adhesion junction is soldered or welded. The loop is formed between two separate strands of blank .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 45/08; D03C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 45/08 (2006.01); D03C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 9/028 (2013.01); B21F 45/08 (2013.01); D03C 9/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1252944 A2 20021030; EP 1252944 A3 20021120; EP 1252944 B1 20070606; CH 695240 A5 20060215; DE 50210255 D1 20070719; JP 2002302842 A 20021018; JP 2008196106 A 20080828; JP 4542168 B2 20100908

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110104

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110202

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-04-20 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20101110

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-01-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-08-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-04-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: STAUBLI LYON

- Effective date: 20080305

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: GROS-BECKERT K.G.PARKWEG 2, D-72458 ALBSTADT

- Effective date: 20070606

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: GROS-BECKERT K.G.

- Effective date: 20070606

2007-11-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GROZ-BECKERT KG

2007-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210255 P 20070719

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT TR

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT TR

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI