Global Patent Index - EP 1252980 A3

EP 1252980 A3 2003-06-25 - Hair removing device with a lotion applicator

Title (en)

Hair removing device with a lotion applicator

Title (de)

Haarentfernungsgerät mit Lotionsapplikator

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'épilation avec applicateur de lotion

Publication

EP 1252980 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02009160 A

Priority

  • JP 2001180805 A
  • JP 2001133082 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1252980A2] A hair removing device capable of feeding a lotion in association with a hair removing operation. The device has a treatment head (20) that is mounted on a housing (10) and includes a hair removing unit (30) for hair depilation or hair epilation and an applicator (110) for supplying a lotion on a user's skin. Also included in the device is a tank (140) holding the lotion and a lotion supply mechanism (150) for supplying the lotion from the tank to the applicator. The treatment head is formed with an actuator (124) which acknowledges an even of the treatment head coming into an operative condition with the skin and activates a lotion supply mechanism to supply the lotion from the tank to the applicator when such event is acknowledged. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 19/40; A45D 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/44 (2006.01); A45D 26/00 (2006.01); B26B 19/40 (2006.01); A45D 34/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/0023 (2013.01); B26B 19/40 (2013.01); A45D 34/04 (2013.01); A45D 2026/009 (2013.01); A45D 2026/0095 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1252980 A2 20021030; EP 1252980 A3 20030625; EP 1252980 B1 20100310; CN 1239298 C 20060201; CN 1383960 A 20021211; DE 60235592 D1 20100422; KR 100523523 B1 20051024; KR 20020083446 A 20021102; TW I227689 B 20050211; US 2002161380 A1 20021031; US 2005021051 A1 20050127; US 6913606 B2 20050705; US 7402165 B2 20080722

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60235592

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60235592

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130508

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100510

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100610

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100610

2011-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101213

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60235592 P 20100422

2010-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-02-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS CO., LTD.

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031212

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26B 19/40 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 45D 26/00 B

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI