Global Patent Index - EP 1253189 A3

EP 1253189 A3 2003-06-18 - Builder composition

Title (en)

Builder composition

Title (de)

Builder-Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition d'adjuvant

Publication

EP 1253189 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02008621 A

Priority

DE 10121051 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1253189A2] Production of a builder composition comprises mixing a crystalline layered sodium silicate (I) with water or an aqueous solution or dispersion of at least one detergent ingredient in a specified (I):water molar ratio. Production of a builder composition comprises mixing a crystalline layered sodium silicate of formula NaMSixO2x-1.yH2O (I) with water or an aqueous solution or dispersion of at least one detergent ingredient in a (I):water molar ratio of 0.5-20:1, and heat-treating the mixture at 30-400 degrees C for 0.5-1000 minutes. M = Na or H; x = 1.9-4; y = 0-20.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/1273 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1253189 A2 20021030; EP 1253189 A3 20030618; EP 1253189 B1 20061115; DE 10121051 A1 20021031; DE 50208676 D1 20061228; ES 2273939 T3 20070516; JP 2002363594 A 20021218; US 2003073605 A1 20030417; US 6908896 B2 20050621

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090417

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090418

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090418

2010-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090417

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090417

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080416

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080310

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2273939 T3

2007-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070227

2006-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208676 P 20061228

2006-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2006-11-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI