Global Patent Index - EP 1253272 B1

EP 1253272 B1 2007-10-10 - Fitting assembly with securing mounting part

Title (en)

Fitting assembly with securing mounting part

Title (de)

Beschlaganordnung mit Beschlagteilsicherung

Title (fr)

Ensemble ferrure avec élément de fixation

Publication

EP 1253272 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01110550 A

Priority

EP 01110550 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1253272A1] The mounting securing part is a sliding part (16) with at least one guide part (21), at least one securing part and at least one fixing part. The sliding part can be moved in the direction of the projection of a protruding profile (41) from a released position into a locking position. In the released position, the securing part is not engaged with a fitting part (2), and in the locking position the sliding part supports the fitting part against a counter-bearing in the frame profile (35), whilst the fixing part prevents the sliding part from being moved into the released position. The frame profile has at least one protruding profile with at least one undercut (44, 45). A fitting part has at least one retaining protruding profile (6, 7) for engaging with the undercut. In the engaged position, at least one mounting securing part is used to prevent the disengagement of the undercut and profile.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/0238 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1253272 A1 20021030; EP 1253272 B1 20071010; AT 375428 T 20071015; DE 50113120 D1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160428

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160428

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 375428 T

- Effective date: 20160428

2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113120 P 20071122

2007-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2002-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010807

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI