Global Patent Index - EP 1253481 A3

EP 1253481 A3 2009-02-18 - Direct imaging process with feed back control by measuring the amount of toner deposited

Title (en)

Direct imaging process with feed back control by measuring the amount of toner deposited

Title (de)

Direktes Bilderzeugungsverfahren mit Rückkopplungssteuerung mittels Messung der deponierten Tonermenge

Title (fr)

Procédé direct de formation d'images avec commande de rétroaction par mesure de la quantité de toner déposée

Publication

EP 1253481 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02076726 A

Priority

  • EP 02076726 A
  • EP 01201550 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1253481A2] Image forming device comprising an image forming element (10) moving past an image forming station (12) in which toner (38) is deposited on the surface of the image forming element, said image forming element having at least one electrode (22, 24) extending over a predetermined surface area (20) of the image forming element, characterized by a impedance/capacitance measuring circuit (42) measuring the amount of toner deposited on said predetermined surface area (20) on the basis of a resulting change in the impedance/capacitance of the electrode (22, 24).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/34 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/5037 (2013.01); G03G 15/348 (2013.01); G03G 15/5041 (2013.01); G03G 2217/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1253481 A2 20021030; EP 1253481 A3 20090218; EP 1253481 B1 20101110

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170417

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170502

2018-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170501

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171103

2018-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171229

2017-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170417

2017-12-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170501

2017-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60238227

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160407

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-12-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60238227

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-02-16 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60238227 P 20101223

2010-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2010-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090921

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03G 15/34 20060101AFI20090115BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03G 15/00 20060101ALI20090115BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03G 15/08 20060101ALI20090115BHEP

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI