Global Patent Index - EP 1253848 A2

EP 1253848 A2 2002-11-06 - DEVICE FOR DRYING SHOES, GLOVES OR GARMENTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DRYING SHOES, GLOVES OR GARMENTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM TROCKNEN VON SCHUHEN, HANDSCHUHEN ODER KLEIDUNGSSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR SECHER DES CHAUSSURES, DES GANTS OU DES VETEMENTS

Publication

EP 1253848 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01911550 A

Priority

  • DE 20001932 U
  • EP 0100946 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0156450A2] The invention relates to a device for drying shoes, gloves or garments comprising a fan which produces an airflow and which is accommodated in a housing. The housing comprises two openings that are connected to two tube sockets which are arranged opposite one another and which are fastened to said housing. The tube sockets are connected to tubes for guiding the airflow. To this end, the tube sockets are angular and one end of each tube socket is rotatably connected to the housing while forming a swivel joint.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 23/20; D06F 59/04; F26B 9/00; F26B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 23/20 (2006.01); D06F 59/04 (2006.01); F26B 9/00 (2006.01); F26B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 59/04 (2013.01); A47L 23/205 (2013.01); F26B 9/003 (2013.01); F26B 21/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0156450A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20001932 U1 20000420; AT 244535 T 20030715; AU 4055901 A 20010814; EP 1253848 A2 20021106; EP 1253848 B1 20030709; US 2003182817 A1 20031002; US 7469487 B2 20081230; WO 0156450 A2 20010809; WO 0156450 A3 20011227

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 244535 T

- Effective date: 20150130

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-12-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SIDAS CENTRAL GMBH, AT

- Document: AT 244535 T

- Effective date: 20131106

2013-06-21 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SIDAS CENTRAL GMBH IN GRUNDUNG, AT

- Effective date: 20130521

2013-06-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SIDAS CENTRAL GMBH IN GRUNDUNG, AT

- Effective date: 20130521

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIDAS CENTRAL GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIDAS CENTRAL GMBH IN GRUENDUNG, WIEN, AT

- Document: DE 50100366

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100366

- Representative's name: PFENNING MEINIG & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100366

- Representative's name: PFENNING, MEINIG & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-03-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100366

- Representative's name: PFENNING MEINIG & PARTNER GBR, DE

2013-03-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIDAS CENTRAL GMBH IN GRUENDUNG, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THERM-IC PRODUCTS GMBH NFG. & CO. KG, GLEISDORF, AT

- Document: DE 50100366

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-03-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIDAS CENTRAL GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THERM-IC PRODUCTS GMBH NFG. & CO. KG, GLEISDORF, AT

- Document: DE 50100366

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100366

- Representative's name: PFENNING MEINIG & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100366

- Representative's name: PFENNING, MEINIG & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-01-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100366

- Representative's name: PFENNING MEINIG & PARTNER GBR, DE

2012-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: THERM-IC PRODUCTS GMBH NFG. & CO KG, AT

- Document: AT 244535 T

- Effective date: 20120305

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIDAS CENTRAL GMBH IN GRUENDUNG, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THERM-IC PRODUCTS GMBH, GLEISDORF, AT

- Document: DE 50100366

- Effective date: 20111213

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIDAS CENTRAL GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THERM-IC PRODUCTS GMBH, GLEISDORF, AT

- Document: DE 50100366

- Effective date: 20111213

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THERM-IC PRODUCTS GMBH NFG. & CO. KG, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THERM-IC PRODUCTS GMBH, GLEISDORF, AT

- Document: DE 50100366

- Effective date: 20111213

2012-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100366

- Representative's name: PFENNING MEINIG & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20111213

2012-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100366

- Representative's name: RAINER BECK, AT

- Effective date: 20111213

2012-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100366

- Representative's name: PFENNING, MEINIG & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20111213

2011-12-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100366

- Representative's name: RAINER BECK, AT

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100366 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI