Global Patent Index - EP 1253849 A1

EP 1253849 A1 2002-11-06 - FLUID CONNECTION SYSTEM FOR ENDOSCOPE REPROCESSING WITH CONTROLLED LEAKAGE

Title (en)

FLUID CONNECTION SYSTEM FOR ENDOSCOPE REPROCESSING WITH CONTROLLED LEAKAGE

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITSVERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ENDOSKOP MIT KONTROLLIERBARER FLUIDLECKAGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RACCORDEMENT FLUIDIQUE DESTINE AU RETRAITEMENT ENDOSCOPIQUE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE FUITES

Publication

EP 1253849 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01908932 A

Priority

  • US 0103962 W
  • US 49913400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0156459A1] A tethered interconnection assembly (50) supplies an antimicrobial fluid to interior passages of an endoscope during a microbial decontamination cycle. The tethered connection assembly includes tube assemblies (56) with fittings (60, 62, 64) which are uniquely configured for interconnection with an appropriate one of a high pressure port (28), a low pressure port (28), and optionally a leak detector port (36). Fittings (74) at the other end of the tube assemblies are configured for interconnection with appropriate corresponding ports of the endoscope. The tube assemblies (56) are interconnected by a tether (52) to which plurality of plugs (58) for plugging appropriate ports of the endoscope are also connected. A tag (54) identifies the model(s) of endoscope that the tethered connection assembly is to be used with and provides a diagram showing the proper interconnection pattern.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61L 2/18 (2006.01); A61B 1/12 (2006.01); A61B 1/227 (2006.01); A61B 1/233 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 1/00057 (2013.01); A61B 1/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0156459A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0156459 A1 20010809; AT 286364 T 20050115; AU 2001236742 B2 20041014; AU 3674201 A 20010814; CA 2398835 A1 20010809; CA 2398835 C 20090728; CA 2664788 A1 20010809; CA 2664788 C 20111108; DE 60108220 D1 20050210; DE 60108220 T2 20051215; EP 1253849 A1 20021106; EP 1253849 B1 20050105; ES 2236182 T3 20050716; JP 2003521325 A 20030715; JP 4680468 B2 20110511; US 6485684 B1 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120208

2013-08-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130823

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120207

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60108220

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-09-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60108220

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER, DE

2012-09-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60108220

- Representative's name: DOMPATENT VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNE, DE

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090208

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110309

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090209

2009-11-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090207

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-13 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AMERICAN STERILIZER CY

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-10-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: AMERICAN STERILIZER COMPANY

- Free text: STERIS INC.#43425 BUSINESS PARK DRIVE#TEMECULA, CALIFORNIA 92590 (US) -TRANSFER TO- AMERICAN STERILIZER COMPANY#5960 HEISLEY ROAD#MENTOR, OH 44060 (US)

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050605

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: AMERICAN STERILIZER CY5960 HEISLEY ROAD, US - MENT

- Effective date: 20050105

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: AMERICAN STERILIZER CY

- Effective date: 20050105

2006-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2236182 T3

2005-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-04-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-04-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60108220 P 20050210

2005-02-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-02-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050207

2005-02-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050207

2005-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-01-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050105

2005-01-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050105

2005-01-05 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050105

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040319

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI