Global Patent Index - EP 1253894 A1

EP 1253894 A1 2002-11-06 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR PREVENTING TRANSMISSION OF SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED DISEASES

Title (en)

METHODS AND DEVICES FOR PREVENTING TRANSMISSION OF SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED DISEASES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM VERHINDERN DER ÜBERTRAGUNG SEXUELL ÜBERTRAGBARER KRANKHEITEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS POUR PREVENIR LA TRANSMISSION DE MALADIES SEXUELLEMENT TRANSMISSIBLES

Publication

EP 1253894 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01906798 A

Priority

  • US 0103043 W
  • US 49420100 A
  • US 54838100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0154636A1] The present invention provides methods for preventing the transmission of HIV, methods for prophylaxis of HIV transmission and methods for reducing the risk of HIV transmission vaginally, rectally, or orally using compositions having at least one of polyquaternium, glycerin, methylparaben or propylparaben. In another aspect, the composition has at least one of surfactants, microbicides, anticellular agents, acid agents, alkaline agents, oxidizing agents, inhibitors, organic solvents, and hypotonic solutions. The invention further provides methods for inhibiting the transmission of a sexually transmitted disease using the compositions. Methods for disinfecting needles and syringes are also disclosed. Additionally, the invention provides combinations of compositions and devices used with such methods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 9/02; A61K 9/00; A61K 45/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/0034 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0154636 A1 20010802; WO 0154636 A9 20021024; AU 3466501 A 20010807; AU 783242 B2 20051006; CA 2398399 A1 20010802; CN 1418077 A 20030514; EP 1253894 A1 20021106; EP 1253894 A4 20050126

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BARON, SAMUEL

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: POAST, JOYCE

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NGUYEN, DERRICK

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CLOYD, MILES, W.

2007-03-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061010

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-01-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041213

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61F 9/02 A

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/00 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 45/06 B

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BARON, SAMUEL

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: POAST, JOYCE

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NGUYEN, DERRICK

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CLOYD, MILES, W.

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI