Global Patent Index - EP 1253919 A1

EP 1253919 A1 2002-11-06 - METHOD AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING AN INFLAMMATORY DISEASE

Title (en)

METHOD AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING AN INFLAMMATORY DISEASE

Title (de)

METHODE UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER ENTZÜNDLICHEN ERKRANKUNG

Title (fr)

METHODE ET COMPOSITIONS DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE INFLAMMATOIRE

Publication

EP 1253919 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01951123 A

Priority

  • US 0103972 W
  • US 18087900 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0158441A1] This invention relates to treating an inflammatory disease by administering a phosphodiesterase 4 inhibitor in combiantion with an inhibitor of prostaglandin synthesis, NSAIDs being exemplary.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/19; A61K 31/40; A61K 31/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/19 (2006.01); A61K 31/121 (2006.01); A61K 31/275 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/60 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/60 (2013.01); A61K 31/19 (2013.01); A61K 31/40 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/19 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 31/40 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A61K 31/60 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0158441 A1 20010816; AU 7205701 A 20010820; BR 0108087 A 20021029; CA 2398184 A1 20010816; CN 1398181 A 20030219; CZ 20022682 A3 20030917; EP 1253919 A1 20021106; EP 1253919 A4 20070314; HU 0300689 A2 20030728; HU 0300689 A3 20030929; IL 150963 D0 20030212; JP 2003522142 A 20030722; MX PA02007688 A 20021213; NO 20023737 A 20020927; NO 20023737 D0 20020807; PL 356447 A1 20040628; ZA 200206252 B 20030826

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1051319

2008-05-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071113

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070702

2007-03-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070209

2007-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/19 20060101AFI20010821BHEP

2007-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/40 20060101ALI20070206BHEP

2007-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/60 20060101ALI20070206BHEP

2007-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 45/06 20060101ALI20070206BHEP

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20020806