Global Patent Index - EP 1253926 A1

EP 1253926 A1 2002-11-06 - COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF A DISEASE MEDIATED BY THE ALPHA-2B-ADRENOCEPTOR

Title (en)

COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF A DISEASE MEDIATED BY THE ALPHA-2B-ADRENOCEPTOR

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGEN DIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND PROPHYLAXE VON DURCH ALPHA-2B-ADRENOZEPTOR VERMITTELTEN ERKRANKUNGEN NÜTZLICH SIND

Title (fr)

COMPOSE UTILE POUR LE TRAITEMENT OU LA PREVENTION D'UNE MALADIE MEDIEE PAR LE RECEPTEUR ADRENERGIQUE ALPHA 2B

Publication

EP 1253926 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01907585 A

Priority

  • FI 0100105 W
  • FI 20000303 A
  • US 18202100 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0158454A1] The present invention relates to the use of a selective alpha-2B-adrenoceptor antagonist for the manufacture of a pharmaceutical preparation useful for the treatment or prevention of a disease mediated by the alpha-2B-adrenoceptor in a mammal. Said antagonist is a compound selected from the group consisting of compounds A, B, C, D and E disclosed in Scheme I, or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt of said compound. The present invention also relates to a method for the treatment or prevention of a disease mediated by the alpha-2B-adrenoceptor in a mammal. Said method comprises administering to said mammal an effective amount of said selective alpha-2B-adrenoceptor antagonist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/63; A61K 31/635; A61P 9/10; A61P 9/12; C07D 239/69

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/635 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 3/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 15/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/06 (2006.01); C07D 239/42 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 239/42 (2013.01); A61K 31/635 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); C07D 403/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0158454A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0158454 A1 20010816; AU 3551001 A 20010820; AU 780802 B2 20050421; BR 0108221 A 20030305; CA 2399421 A1 20010816; CZ 20022884 A3 20030212; EA 200200846 A1 20021226; EE 200200435 A 20031215; EP 1253926 A1 20021106; GE P20043356 B 20040413; HR P20020746 A2 20041231; HU 0300032 A2 20030528; HU 0300032 A3 20060130; IL 151017 D0 20030212; IS 6476 A 20020719; JP 2003522148 A 20030722; KR 20020080413 A 20021023; MX PA02007454 A 20040823; NO 20023773 A 20020809; NO 20023773 D0 20020809; NZ 520500 A 20050128; PL 357872 A1 20040726; SK 11472002 A3 20030204; YU 59102 A 20051128

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1049620

2006-12-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WURSTER, SIEGFRIED

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENGSTROEM, MIA

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HUOVINEN, LIISA

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KALLIOKOSKI, SARI

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KELANNE, LEILA

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SAVOLA, EEVA-LIISA

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040617

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020725

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020725;LT PAYMENT 20020725;LV PAYMENT 20020725;MK PAYMENT 20020725;RO PAYMENT 20020725;SI PAYMENT 20020725